NY A01966 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York State Phoenix Act"; extends the statute of limitations for felony family offenses to ten years and misdemeanor family offenses to five years.
Title
Enacts the "New York State Phoenix Act"; extends the statute of limitations for felony family offenses to ten years and misdemeanor family offenses to five years.
Sponsors
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | print number 1966a |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03020 (Same As) 2022-04-26 - referred to codes