NY A02015 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the enforcement of provisions relating to carriers of household goods by motor vehicle; authorizes the attorney general to seek an injunction to enjoin and restrain the continuance or threat of certain violations by such carriers.
Title
Relates to the enforcement of provisions relating to carriers of household goods by motor vehicle; authorizes the attorney general to seek an injunction to enjoin and restrain the continuance or threat of certain violations by such carriers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.442 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.442 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | print number 2015a |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02591 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES