NY A02064 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - ordered to third reading rules cal.54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - ordered to third reading rules cal.54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making the provisions governing liquor licenses consistent with respect to public interest factors.
Title
Relates to making the provisions governing liquor licenses consistent with respect to public interest factors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.54 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.54 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | print number 2064a |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00205 (Same As) 2014-05-30 - PRINT NUMBER 205A