NY A02092 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-06 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-06 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the uniform election night procedure act.
Title
Relates to establishing the uniform election night procedure act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.32 |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S07090 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS