NY A02140 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of environmental conservation, with the assistance of other state departments and agencies, to conduct a study on the quality of life and human health impacts at John F. Kennedy international airport and LaGuardia airport.
Title
Directs the department of environmental conservation, with the assistance of other state departments and agencies, to conduct a study on the quality of life and human health impacts at John F. Kennedy international airport and LaGuardia airport.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.91 |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.721 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1482 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S966B |
2021-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.80 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.80 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | print number 2140b |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | print number 2140a |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00966 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2140B