NY A02257 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.315
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.315
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The bill creates the category of crim- inal trespass by a level two or level three sex offender if he or she enters a school where the victim of his or her offense attends or formerly attended, with some exceptions.
Title
Establishes a person is guilty of criminal trespass in the second degree when he or she, being required to maintain registration as a sex offender, enters or remains in a school knowing that the victim of his or her offense attends or formerly attended such school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | signed chap.315 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-10 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-10 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-10 | 3RD READING CAL.414 | |
2010-06-10 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1606B | |
2010-06-09 | RECOMMITTED TO CODES | |
2010-06-09 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-09 | repassed assembly | |
2010-04-19 | amended on third reading 2257b | |
2010-04-08 | amended on third reading 2257a | |
2010-04-08 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | |
2010-04-08 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-04-08 | recalled from senate | |
2010-02-22 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2010-02-22 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-22 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.187 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-28 | advanced to third reading cal.650 | |
2009-05-27 | reported | |
2009-01-15 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S1606 (Same As) 2010-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2257B