NY A02404 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the New York state masters-in-education teacher incentive scholarship program.
Title
Relates to the New York state masters-in-education teacher incentive scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.189 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.619 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a2404 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1172 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5985 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.619 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.619 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05985 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.189