NY A02449 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - approval memo.7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a pilot program to provide job and vocational skills training to youth who have been adjudicated juvenile delinquents or juvenile offenders residing in a facility overseen by the office of children and family services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a pilot program to provide job and vocational skills training to youth who have been adjudicated juvenile delinquents or juvenile offenders residing in a facility overseen by the office of children and family services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senateapproval memo.7
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.397
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.1747
2018-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2084
2018-02-27SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2018-02-27Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-02-27Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.193
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-05-17SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2017-05-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-17Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-11Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.325
2017-05-09Assemblyreported
2017-02-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-20Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S02084 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2449

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02449&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02449&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02449
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02449&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02449&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02449&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A2449#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback