NY A02549 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the president of the civil service commission to study and publish a report evaluating public employers' wage disparities related to the job titles segregated by the gender, race and/or national origin of the employees in the title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the president of the civil service commission to study and publish a report evaluating public employers' wage disparities related to the job titles segregated by the gender, race and/or national origin of the employees in the title.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.403
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1545
2018-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3262
2018-04-16SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-04-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-04-16Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.204
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-04-04SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2017-04-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-04-04Assemblypassed assembly
2017-03-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.154
2017-03-22Assemblyreported
2017-01-20Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S03262 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2549

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback