NY A02574 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - signed chap.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - signed chap.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the automatic voter registration process; amends certain voter registration processes and the agencies to be included as designated agencies.
Title
Relates to the automatic voter registration process; amends certain voter registration processes and the agencies to be included as designated agencies.
Sponsors
Asm. Latrice Walker [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Assembly | signed chap.37 |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-02-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.139 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2076 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.11 |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | rules report cal.11 |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S02076 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2574