NY A02602 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to actions in contemplation of dismissal in juvenile delinquency and persons in need of supervision cases.
Title
Relates to actions in contemplation of dismissal in juvenile delinquency and persons in need of supervision cases.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. William Magee [D] | Asm. Francisco Moya [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.145 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.460 |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | print number 2602b |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | print number 2602a |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2013-01-16 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S03831 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES