NY A02653 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-4)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - print number 2653a
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - print number 2653a
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows commuter vans to accept hails from prospective passengers in the street.
Title
Allows commuter vans to accept hails from prospective passengers in the street.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Assembly | print number 2653a |
2024-04-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06781 (Same As) 2024-04-03 - PRINT NUMBER 6781A