NY A02688 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if it appears that a death may have resulted from the commission of a crime, the coroner or medical examiner in any county with geographic jurisdiction over the crime shall have concurrent jurisdiction and authority to investigate the death.
Title
Provides that if it appears that a death may have resulted from the commission of a crime, the coroner or medical examiner in any county with geographic jurisdiction over the crime shall have concurrent jurisdiction and authority to investigate the death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-02-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-02-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-02-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.319 |
2012-01-31 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-09 | Assembly | committed to local governments |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.118 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-02-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-02-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.37 |
2011-02-08 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |