NY A02720 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to operating a vessel while under the influence of alcohol or drugs; provides that no person shall operate a vessel while such person has .18 of one per centum or more by weight of alcohol in such person's blood as shown by chemical analysis of such person's blood, breath, urine or saliva; provided, further, that no person shall operate a vessel in violation of paragraph (b) of this section while a child who is fifteen years of age or less is a passenger in such vessel; relates to the effect of prior convictions for operation of certain vehicles while intoxicated upon imposition of penalties for boating while intoxicated; requires all persons who operate a mechanically propelled vessel to hold a boating safety certificate.
Title
Relates to operating a vessel while under the influence of alcohol or drugs; provides that no person shall operate a vessel while such person has .18 of one per centum or more by weight of alcohol in such person's blood as shown by chemical analysis of such person's blood, breath, urine or saliva; provided, further, that no person shall operate a vessel in violation of paragraph (b) of this section while a child who is fifteen years of age or less is a passenger in such vessel; relates to the effect of prior convictions for operation of certain vehicles while intoxicated upon imposition of penalties for boating while intoxicated; requires all persons who operate a mechanically propelled vessel to hold a boating safety certificate.
Sponsors
Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Michelle Schimel [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Robert Sweeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Assembly | held for consideration in transportation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-01-17 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00771 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES