NY A02736 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the transfer of the regional state park police to the division of state police; and repeals certain provisions related thereto.
Title
Provides for the transfer of the regional state park police to the division of state police; and repeals certain provisions related thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | print number 2736a |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-01-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03676 (Same As) 2020-03-19 - PRINT NUMBER 3676A