NY A02758 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a temporary task force to, among other things, develop OMRDD eligibility guidelines that are sensitive to the disabling effects of cerebral palsy, epilepsy, neurological impairment, familial dysautonomia and autism.
Title
An act to establish a temporary task force on developmental disabilities and establishing the powers and duties thereof; and providing for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to mental health | |
2009-02-25 | print number 2758a | |
2009-02-25 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2009-02-03 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-21 | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S370-A (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES