NY A02794 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to develop and maternal health care providers to distribute written information about episiotomy to maternity patients.
Title
Requires the department of health to develop and maternal health care providers to distribute written information about episiotomy to maternity patients.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.79 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.13 |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01877 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES