NY A02800 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - print number 2800a
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - print number 2800a
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases medicaid reimbursement payment aggregate for private duty nursing services and care by 15 million dollars for period 7/1/12 to 3/31/13, and by 20 million dollars annually thereafter for each period from April 1 to March 31.
Title
Increases medicaid reimbursement payment aggregate for private duty nursing services and care by 15 million dollars for period 7/1/12 to 3/31/13, and by 20 million dollars annually thereafter for each period from April 1 to March 31.
Sponsors
Asm. Rhoda Jacobs [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] |
Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Assembly | print number 2800a |
2012-03-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2011-01-20 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S00980 (Same As) 2012-03-07 - PRINT NUMBER 980A