NY A02832 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers to provide an insurer or subscriber who is a victim of domestic violence, upon request of such insurer or subscriber, with the option to designate alternative contact information for the purpose of receiving specific claim information or for specific billing purposes.
Title
Requires health insurers to provide an insurer or subscriber who is a victim of domestic violence, upon request of such insurer or subscriber, with the option to designate alternative contact information for the purpose of receiving specific claim information or for specific billing purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.120 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.285 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-25 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S00067 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE