NY A02927 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in judicial proceedings to review real property assessments in cities of one million or more inhabitants, the assessing method, capitalization rate, and other data or formula used to determine valuation must be disclosed to the petitioner.
Title
Provides that in judicial proceedings to review real property assessments in cities of one million or more inhabitants, the assessing method, capitalization rate, and other data or formula used to determine valuation must be disclosed to the petitioner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.164 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.390 |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-22 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |