NY A02954 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.214
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes educational institutions to agree to pay for all or a portion of the salaries and compensation payable to municipal school crossing guards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes educational institutions to agree to pay for all or a portion of the salaries and compensation payable to municipal school crossing guards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.214
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.387
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S367B
2018-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.149
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.149
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-03Assemblyprint number 2954b
2018-05-03Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-05-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-05-15Assemblyprint number 2954a
2017-05-15Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2017-01-23Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S00367 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2954B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02954&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02954&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02954
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02954&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02954A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02954&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02954B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02954&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02954&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02954&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02954&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A2954#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback