NY A02957 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides factors to be considered when a health care practitioner's opinion differs from that of referral's treating health care practitioner as to a disability; requires such health care practitioner to provide an explicit written determination and to present evidence when such practitioner's diagnosis differs from that of the treating health care practitioner who referred the patient.
Title
Provides factors to be considered when a health care practitioner's opinion differs from that of referral's treating health care practitioner as to a disability; requires such health care practitioner to provide an explicit written determination and to present evidence when such practitioner's diagnosis differs from that of the treating health care practitioner who referred the patient.
Sponsors
Asm. Keith Wright [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. William Boyland [D] |
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. John McEneny [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.171 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.171 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2011-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.452 |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-21 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01326 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES