NY A02991 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases terms of members of legislature commencing with election in 2018 to four years.
Title
Increases terms of members of legislature commencing with election in 2018 to four years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2014-01-10 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2013-01-25 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2013-01-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |