NY A02995 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Grants immunity from liability to organizations which establish physician committees the purpose of which is to confront and refer to treatment physicians who are thought to be suffering from addiction or mental illness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants immunity from liability to organizations which establish physician committees the purpose of which is to confront and refer to treatment physicians who are thought to be suffering from addiction or mental illness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-20Assemblyprint number 2995a
2019-02-20Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01796 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - PRINT NUMBER 1796A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback