NY A03090 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 85-13)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-29 - print number 3090a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-29 - print number 3090a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the purchase of zero-emission buses and the procurement of electric-powered buses, vehicles or other related equipment.
Title
Relates to the purchase of zero-emission buses and the procurement of electric-powered buses, vehicles or other related equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | Assembly | print number 3090a |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03535 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - referred to transportation