NY A03116 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s454a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s454a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs counties and the city of New York to contact a veterans' organization to provide for the disposition of the unclaimed remains of a deceased veteran when such veteran has no next of kin or other person designated to provide for the disposition of his or her remains; provides process.
Title
Directs counties and the city of New York to contact a veterans' organization to provide for the disposition of the unclaimed remains of a deceased veteran when such veteran has no next of kin or other person designated to provide for the disposition of his or her remains; provides process.
Sponsors
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s454a |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.685 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | print number 3116a |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S00454 (Same As) 2023-11-10 - SIGNED CHAP.620