NY A03168 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires posting notice of the department of financial services toll free consumer's hot-line telephone number.
Title
Requires posting notice of the department of financial services toll free consumer's hot-line telephone number.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.423 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.71 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a3168 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1320 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s4931 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.71 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.71 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S04931 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.423