NY A03173 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.267
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.267
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain practices by businesses making an automatic renewal or continuous service offer to consumers in the state; provides exemptions.
Title
Prohibits certain practices by businesses making an automatic renewal or continuous service offer to consumers in the state; provides exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.267 |
2020-10-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.285 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | substituted for a3173a |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2020-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.435 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-03 | Senate | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1475A |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.73 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | substituted by s1475a |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.285 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | print number 3173a |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S01475 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.267