NY A03186 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a civil cause of action for human trafficking; allows for actions relating to human trafficking to be commenced within fifteen years after the victimization has occurred.
Title
Relates to a civil cause of action for human trafficking; allows for actions relating to human trafficking to be commenced within fifteen years after the victimization has occurred.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s672 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.424 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S00672 (Same As) 2021-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.311