NY A03193 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - substituted by s4925a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Broadens the geriatric service demonstration program to include older adults with mental health disabilities and substance use disorder; renames the program to be the geriatric mental health and substance use disorder demonstration program; allows for grants to be awarded by the office to providers of care to older adults with substance use disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadens the geriatric service demonstration program to include older adults with mental health disabilities and substance use disorder; renames the program to be the geriatric mental health and substance use disorder demonstration program; allows for grants to be awarded by the office to providers of care to older adults with substance use disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30Assemblysubstituted by s4925a
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.397
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-01Assemblyprint number 3193a
2019-05-01Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to aging
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to aging

Same As/Similar To

S04925 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback