NY A03212 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.754
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.754
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to claims for loss or damage to real property; creates continuing education requirements for licensed persons and qualifications for public and independent adjusters; allows for a revocation of licenses with an opportunity to reapply for such licenses.
Title
Relates to claims for loss or damage to real property; creates continuing education requirements for licensed persons and qualifications for public and independent adjusters; allows for a revocation of licenses with an opportunity to reapply for such licenses.
Sponsors
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.754 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07814 (Same As) 2016-05-12 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE