NY A03214 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for community service as one of the punishments for the violation of a local law in a municipality.
Title
Provides for community service as one of the punishments for the violation of a local law in a municipality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to local governments |