NY A03225 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - substituted by s2271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - substituted by s2271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies requirements for acknowledgements, proofs, oaths and affirmations without the state.
Title
Clarifies requirements for acknowledgements, proofs, oaths and affirmations without the state.
Sponsors
Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Assembly | substituted by s2271 |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.366 |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02271 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - returned to senate