NY A03260 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - reference changed to higher education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - reference changed to higher education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Haitian Earthquake victims survivor college scholarship program for persons and children or spouses of persons who survived the January twelfth, two thousand ten earthquake in Haiti.
Title
Establishes a Haitian Earthquake victims survivor college scholarship program for persons and children or spouses of persons who survived the January twelfth, two thousand ten earthquake in Haiti.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Assembly | reference changed to higher education |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
2011-12-16 | Assembly | print number 3260a |
2011-12-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2011-01-24 | Assembly | referred to education |