NY A03281 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-17 - print number 3281c
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-17 - print number 3281c
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To permit the use of the instant run off voting method on a trial basis in elections in the years 2011, 2012 and 2013. This pilot program would permit the State Legislature to evaluate the broader application of the instant runoff voting method.
Title
Establishes an instant runoff voting method for certain local elections for races with three or more candidates; insures majority support for elected officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | print number 3281c | |
2010-05-17 | amend and recommit to election law | |
2010-04-15 | print number 3281b | |
2010-04-15 | amend and recommit to election law | |
2010-01-06 | referred to election law | |
2009-03-31 | print number 3281a | |
2009-03-31 | amend (t) and recommit to election law | |
2009-01-23 | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S3584 (Same As) 2010-06-02 - referred to election law