NY A03322 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - print number 3322a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - print number 3322a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires SUNY to offer abortion by medication techniques at all on-campus student health centers at colleges or universities within the SUNY system; creates a fund to help finance the implementation of offering such services at SUNY on-campus student health centers.
Title
Requires SUNY to offer abortion by medication techniques at all on-campus student health centers at colleges or universities within the SUNY system; creates a fund to help finance the implementation of offering such services at SUNY on-campus student health centers.
Sponsors
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Assembly | print number 3322a |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S09444 (Same As) 2022-10-26 - PRINT NUMBER 9444A