NY A03383 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - print number 3383b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to capital program plans; provides that the MTA shall submit to the MTA capital program review board two capital program plans on or before January 31, 2024 and every fifth year thereafter; provides that all future capital program plans be submitted January 31 of the required years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to capital program plans; provides that the MTA shall submit to the MTA capital program review board two capital program plans on or before January 31, 2024 and every fifth year thereafter; provides that all future capital program plans be submitted January 31 of the required years.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03Assemblyprint number 3383b
2019-04-03Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-03-13Assemblyprint number 3383a
2019-03-13Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05050 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback