NY A03400 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-31 - print number 3400a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-31 - print number 3400a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts diesel motor fuel used by and sold to ambulance services from certain taxes.
Title
Exempts diesel motor fuel used by and sold to ambulance services from certain taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Assembly | print number 3400a |
2012-01-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-01-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02717 (Same As) 2012-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 2717A