NY A03411 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the board of elections shall transfer a registration and enrollment of a voter to wherever they move in the state, even if the voter moves to a new county.
Title
Provides that the board of elections shall transfer a registration and enrollment of a voter to wherever they move in the state, even if the voter moves to a new county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.198 |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01732 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS