NY A03617 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends supplementary medical insurance benefits reimbursement amount to include additional charges other than the premium charge; defines health benefit plan of supplementary medical insurance benefits.
Title
Amends supplementary medical insurance benefits reimbursement amount to include additional charges other than the premium charge; defines health benefit plan of supplementary medical insurance benefits.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | committed to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S02050 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE