NY A03720 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "minority mental health act" to establish the division of minority mental health within the office of mental health; such division shall be responsible for assuring that mental health programs and services are culturally and linguistically appropriate to meet the needs of racial and ethnic minorities.
Title
Enacts the "minority mental health act" to establish the division of minority mental health within the office of mental health; such division shall be responsible for assuring that mental health programs and services are culturally and linguistically appropriate to meet the needs of racial and ethnic minorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2011-01-26 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S03063 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES