NY A03724 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-23 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-23 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for the defense and indemnification of parents serving in certain authorized positions in New York City community school districts in suits filed by school officials.
Title
An act to amend the education law, in relation to the defense and indemnification of certain persons serving in the New York city school district
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2010-02-23 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-23 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.279 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-03-19 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2009-03-19 | delivered to senate | |
2009-03-19 | passed assembly | |
2009-03-12 | advanced to third reading cal.227 | |
2009-03-10 | reported | |
2009-03-03 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-01-28 | referred to education |