NY A03738 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-20 - print number 3738a
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-20 - print number 3738a
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a twelve percent surcharge on the sale of animals by pet dealers and an animal shelter and wildlife rehabilitator account to be administered by an animal protection organization to be chosen by the comptroller and the commissioner of agriculture and markets.
Title
Establishes a twelve percent surcharge on the sale of animals by pet dealers and an animal shelter and wildlife rehabilitator account to be administered by an animal protection organization to be chosen by the comptroller and the commissioner of agriculture and markets.
Sponsors
Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Matthew Titone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-20 | Assembly | print number 3738a |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S00952 (Same As) 2016-02-17 - PRINT NUMBER 952A