NY A03740 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-20 - print number 3740a
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-20 - print number 3740a
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases maximum income eligibility levels for real property tax exemptions for seniors.
Title
Increases maximum income eligibility levels for real property tax exemptions for seniors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-20 | Assembly | print number 3740a |
2012-01-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2011-01-27 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S02212 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - referred to aging