NY A03754 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - RECOMMITTED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - RECOMMITTED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for source separation and disposal of recyclable materials and requires municipalities to adopt local laws providing therefor; prohibits transporters from commingling recyclables with other materials; prohibits incinerators and landfills from accepting recyclables.
Title
Provides for source separation and disposal of recyclable materials and requires municipalities to adopt local laws providing therefor; prohibits transporters from commingling recyclables with other materials; prohibits incinerators and landfills from accepting recyclables.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3754a |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-02 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2014-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.184 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.145 |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00719 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION