NY A03765 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes certain deputy sheriffs from Monroe county as peace officers.
Title
Includes certain deputy sheriffs from Monroe county as peace officers.
Sponsors
Asm. David Gantt [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | tabled |
2014-11-21 | Senate | vetoed memo.487 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-03-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.138 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4892A |
2014-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.186 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.98 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.98 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | print number 3765a |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04892 (Same As) 2014-03-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3765A