NY A03769 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - amended on third reading 3769a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - amended on third reading 3769a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the appointment and promotion of supervisors of the fire alarm dispatcher service; requires that a promotion be based on merit and fitness as determined by competitive examination, due weight being given to seniority.
Title
Relates to the appointment and promotion of supervisors of the fire alarm dispatcher service; requires that a promotion be based on merit and fitness as determined by competitive examination, due weight being given to seniority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3769a |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.98 |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.17 |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S00179 (Same As) 2024-03-12 - referred to governmental employees