NY A03827 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-27 - print number 3827a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-27 - print number 3827a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
This bill revises procedures for the issuance of retail licenses and special retail licenses for on-premises consumption for premises within five hundred feet of three or more existing premises.
Title
Revises procedures regarding the issuance of both retail and special retail liquor licenses for on-premises consumption for premises located within 500 feet of 3 or more existing premises in cities, towns and villages of twenty thousand or more; provides that the hearing which the authority is required to hold before issuing such a license may be rescheduled, adjourned or continued and that the authority must give notice to the applicant and the municipality or community board of such rescheduled, adjourned or continued hearing; and provides that the authority or commissioners thereof may also hold a public meeting in connection with issuance of such a license which may also be rescheduled, adjourned or continued, and that the authority must give notice to the applicant and the municipality or community board of the meeting, including any rescheduled, adjourned or continued meeting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | print number 3827a | |
2010-01-27 | amend and recommit to economic development | |
2010-01-20 | committed to economic development | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.291 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-03-05 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2009-03-05 | delivered to senate | |
2009-03-05 | passed assembly | |
2009-02-26 | advanced to third reading cal.155 | |
2009-02-24 | reported | |
2009-01-28 | referred to economic development |