NY A03871 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - 3RD READING CAL.417
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - 3RD READING CAL.417
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To require private employers who engage in monitoring or intercepting electronic communications of any employee by any electronic device or system to provide notice of such monitoring.
Title
Requires prior written notice upon hiring and once annually to all employees, informing them of the types of electronic monitoring which may occur; when an employer has reasonable grounds to believe that employees are engaged in conduct which (1) violates the law, (2) violates the legal rights of the employer or the employer's employees, or (3) creates a hostile workplace environment, and electronic monitoring may produce evidence of this misconduct, the employer may conduct monitoring without giving prior written notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 51 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | 3RD READING CAL.417 | |
2010-07-01 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4755A | |
2010-06-30 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-30 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-30 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-08 | amended on third reading 3871b | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.293 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-05-12 | 3RD READING CAL.256 | |
2009-05-12 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4755 | |
2009-05-04 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2009-05-04 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-04 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-30 | advanced to third reading cal.456 | |
2009-04-27 | reported | |
2009-04-23 | print number 3871a | |
2009-04-23 | amend (t) and recommit to codes | |
2009-03-03 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-01-28 | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S4755 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3871A