NY A03935 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s4329a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s4329a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to enter into reciprocity agreements with other states, countries, provinces or territories that issue driver licenses.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to enter into reciprocity agreements with other states, countries, provinces or territories that issue driver licenses.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ramos [D] | Asm. Manny De Los Santos [D] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] |
Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D] | Asm. Eddie Gibbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s4329a |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.810 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | print number 3935a |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04329 (Same As) 2023-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.277